NH HB578 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to standards for mental health courts.
Title
Relative to standards for mental health courts.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerri Cannon [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] | Rep. Mary Walz [D] | Rep. Stephen Shurtleff [D] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-03-22 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 76 |
2021-03-10 | House | Executive Session: 03/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95164452682 |
2021-03-02 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95501229688 |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing: 02/23/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91815905671 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 54 |