NH HB575 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 236-122; House Journal 20, PG. 510-512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 236-122; House Journal 20, PG. 510-512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the position of school nurse coordinator in the department of education and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing the position of school nurse coordinator in the department of education and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 236 N: 122 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 236-122; House Journal 20, PG. 510-512 |
2015-02-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-02-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 18 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 245 |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 2/5/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 3:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 230 |