NH HB572 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 192; Eff: 11/08/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to pharmacist administration of vaccines and allowing a licensed advanced pharmacy technician to administer vaccines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to pharmacist administration of vaccines and allowing a licensed advanced pharmacy technician to administer vaccines.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-16HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 192; Eff: 11/08/2021
2021-07-23HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-21SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-07-12HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2053e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-08SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2053e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-06-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1464s (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 12
2021-05-20SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1464s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16
2021-05-20SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-1464s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16
2021-05-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1464s, 05/20/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24
2021-04-21SenateRemote Hearing: 04/28/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 21
2021-04-07SenateIntroduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 11
2021-04-07HouseReconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
2021-04-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0576h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 35
2021-04-07HouseAmendment # 2021-0576h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 35
2021-03-04HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0576h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 16
2021-03-02HouseExecutive Session: 03/02/2021 12:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99282187833
2021-02-16HousePublic Hearing: 02/16/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94563888809 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 54

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback