NH HB570 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 135; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 06/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 135; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 06/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study career pathways from full-time service year programs to postsecondary education and employment opportunities in support of New Hampshire's future workforce needs.
Title
Establishing a commission to study career pathways from full-time service year programs to postsecondary education and employment opportunities in support of New Hampshire's future workforce needs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 135; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 06/25/2019 |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2011e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 102 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2011e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/15/2019); |
2019-05-08 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1603s (Rep. Myler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 2 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1603s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1603s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1603s, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0041h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 7 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0041h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 7 |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0041h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 6 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 20 |