NH HB570 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - House Signed by Governor 05/09/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0055
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - House Signed by Governor 05/09/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0055
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensure of guides by the fish and game department.
Title
Relative to licensure of guides by the fish and game department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | House Signed by Governor 05/09/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0055 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 15, Pg.293 | |
2011-04-27 | House Enrolled; House Journal 40, PG.1386 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 12, Pg.255 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12, Pg.248 | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/13/11; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/31/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:10 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-23 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0067h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.461 | |
2011-02-23 | House Amendment #0067h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.461 | |
2011-02-11 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0067h; House Calendar 15, PG.306 | |
2011-02-11 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0067h for Feb 23 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.270 | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 ==Executive Session to Follow== | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources; House Journal 11, PG. 191 |