NH HB57 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the state minimum hourly rate.
Title
Relative to the state minimum hourly rate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - OTP (Y: 178 N: 183 NV: 15 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2023-02-22 - House - OTP (Y: 178 N: 183 NV: 18 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2023-02-22 - House - OTP (Y: 178 N: 183 NV: 18 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 56 |
2023-02-22 | House | Lay HB57 on Table (Rep. Adjutant): Motion Failed DV 180-183 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 56 |
2023-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 178-183 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 54 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/08/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 14 |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |