NH HB569 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-131 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to innovation schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to innovation schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - ITL (Y: 200 N: 131 NV: 24 Abs: 45) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-131 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 56
2019-02-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2019-02-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 28
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/06/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback