NH HB568 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB568
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Special Order to the end of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Special Order to the end of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the New Hampshire energy strategy.
Title
Relative to the New Hampshire energy strategy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | Special Order to the end of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/08/2020; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/15/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/09/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0484h: Motion Adopted DV 217-129 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 33 |
2019-03-20 | House | Amendment # 2019-0484h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 33 |
2019-03-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0484h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 34 |
2019-02-28 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-02-06 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 20 |
Same As/Similar To
HB568 (Carry Over) 2019-11-20 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate