NH HB568 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-13 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-13 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to smoking within certain areas of New Hampshire state parks and historic sites.
Title
Relative to smoking within certain areas of New Hampshire state parks and historic sites.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Bolster [R] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-13 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-09-13 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/4/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-07-26 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 8/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-03-01 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.825 | |
2011-02-22 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-02-02 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 11, PG. 191 |