NH HB567 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to using the Atlantic Time Zone in New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to using the Atlantic Time Zone in New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-22SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
2019-04-25SenateHearing: 05/08/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 20
2019-03-18SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9
2019-02-28HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 208-120 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 61
2019-02-28HouseLay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Failed DV 128-200 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 61
2019-02-28HouseFLAM # 2019-0671h (Rep. Josephson): Amendment Failed Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 61
2019-02-20HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-20HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 30
2019-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback