NH HB564 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 225-126 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the use of rubber bullets and tear gas by law enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the use of rubber bullets and tear gas by law enforcement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 225-126 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 11
2021-02-25HouseLay on Table (Rep. Harriott-Gathright): Motion Failed DV 158-193 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 11
2021-02-16HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2021-02-16HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 26
2021-01-28HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2021 11:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98584313159 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout theday (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 53

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback