NH HB564 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 199; Section 3 Effective 6/30/2015, Remaining Effective 7/6/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 199; Section 3 Effective 6/30/2015, Remaining Effective 7/6/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prior authorization for certain prescription drugs.
Title
Relative to prior authorization for certain prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Sen. Kelly Floor Amendment 1898s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-07 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 199; Section 3 Effective 6/30/2015, Remaining Effective 7/6/2015 |
2015-06-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 54, PG. 2102 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1710s (Rep Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1813 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1710s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Sen. Kelly Floor Amendment #2015-1898s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1710s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Special Order HB 564 to the end of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1710s, 5/21/15; Senate Calendar 22 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Hearing: 4/14/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0312h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1210 |
2015-03-12 | House | Amendment #0312h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1210 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0312h for Mar 11 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 426 |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-02-04 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-02-03 | House | ==CANCELED== Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 231 |