NH HB564 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 243-108; House Journal 26, PG.793-796
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 243-108; House Journal 26, PG.793-796
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to simulcast greyhound races.
Title
Relative to simulcast greyhound races.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Vaillancourt [R] | Rep. Peter Schmidt [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Mary Cooney [D] |
Rep. Dudley Dumaine [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - ITL (Y: 243 N: 108 NV: 21 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 243-108; House Journal 26, PG.793-796 |
2013-03-06 | House | Special Order to Mar 13 Without Objection; House Journal 24, PG.703 |
2013-02-20 | House | Proposed Minority Committee Amendment #2013-0365h; House Calendar 22B, PG.575 |
2013-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0365h; House Calendar 22, PG.520 |
2013-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 13 (Vote 11-7; Part I, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.520 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG.200 |