NH HB563 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB563
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the fees for failing to register certain motor vehicles and establishing a commission to study the registration of trailers, semi-trailers, and other vehicles.
Title
Relative to the fees for failing to register certain motor vehicles and establishing a commission to study the registration of trailers, semi-trailers, and other vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2858h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 56 |
2020-01-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-2858h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 56 |
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2858h (NT) (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 15 |
2019-10-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/05/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-10-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-02-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 20 |
Same As/Similar To
HB563 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2858h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)