NH HB560 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to required reporting on waste reduction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to required reporting on waste reduction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment 1986s (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 201 N: 145 NV: 18 Abs: 36) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1986s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateSen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2019-1986s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateSen. Feltes Moved Ought to Pass; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateSpecial Order to when Senators return from a House hearing, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-09SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-25SenateHearing: 04/30/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0920h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-145 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 67
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0980h (NT): Amendment Failed Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 67
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0920h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 67
2019-03-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0980h (NT)
2019-03-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0920h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 20
2019-03-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
2019-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 03/06/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=464&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB560
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=473&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=473
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=109&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0560&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB560&ddlsponsors=&lsr=464
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=134&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0560&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB560&ddlsponsors=&lsr=464
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=135&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0560&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB560&ddlsponsors=&lsr=464

Bill Comments

feedback