NH HB559 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB559
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enabling municipalities to ban single-use sources of plastic pollution.
Title
Enabling municipalities to ban single-use sources of plastic pollution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2820h (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-30 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2019-2820h: 11/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-10-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-10-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/09/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/08/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-09-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-08-28 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/11/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-08-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-08-20 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/03/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-08-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/27/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-08-01 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-06-11 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-03-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing: 03/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 19 |
Same As/Similar To
HB559 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate