NH HB558 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Full Committee Work Session: 10/19/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
Pending: House Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study the use of information technology in the legislative process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study the use of information technology in the legislative process.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-06HouseFull Committee Work Session: 10/19/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
2021-03-09HouseRetained in Committee
2021-02-22HousePublic Hearing: 02/22/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91906391213 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 2 P. 53

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback