NH HB557 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB557
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to funds credited to the harbor dredging and pier maintenance fund and making appropriations for the dredging of Rye harbor and Seabrook/Hampton harbor.
Title
Relative to funds credited to the harbor dredging and pier maintenance fund and making appropriations for the dredging of Rye harbor and Seabrook/Hampton harbor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-10-02 | House | Division I Work Session: 10/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-03-14 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-02-28 | House | Finance Division I Work Session: 03/06/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Finance 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 17 |
2019-02-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0303h (NT): Motion Adopted DV 325-18 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 16 |
2019-02-28 | House | Amendment # 2019-0303h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 16 |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0303h (NT) for 02/27/2019 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 24 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 19 |
Same As/Similar To
HB557 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)