NH HB555 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Pending Motion Committee Amendment # 2023-1433s; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Pending Motion Committee Amendment # 2023-1433s; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriating state general fund surplus toward the retirement system unfunded accrued liability.
Title
Appropriating state general fund surplus toward the retirement system unfunded accrued liability.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Lekas [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] | Rep. Stephen Pearson [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
Rep. Peter Leishman [D] | Rep. Dan McGuire [R] | Rep. Jonah Wheeler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Pending Motion Committee Amendment # 2023-1433s; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1433s, 05/11/2023; Senate Calendar 21 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2023, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 16 |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/16/2023 (Vote 25-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 10 |
2023-03-10 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-25 | House | Division Work Session: 01/31/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Finance House Journal 3 P. 20 |