NH HB555 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to shaken baby syndrome.
Title
Relative to shaken baby syndrome.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 18 |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 11 |
2019-02-06 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/12/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 19 |