NH HB549 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 18 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Enrolled 06/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing gold star family decals for motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing gold star family decals for motor vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18HouseEnrolled 06/13/2019
2019-06-18SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-06HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2409e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019
2019-06-05SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2409e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19
2019-05-23HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1857s (Rep. Sykes): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1857s, Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1857s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1857s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-04SenateHearing: 04/09/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 17
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-20HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0839h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 60
2019-03-20HouseAmendment # 2019-0839h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 60
2019-03-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0839h (NT) for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 37
2019-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203
2019-02-26HousePublic Hearing: 03/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback