NH HB548 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to certain organizations that are authorized to issue decals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to certain organizations that are authorized to issue decals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-09SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/18/2019; Senate Calendar 18
2019-04-04SenateHearing: 04/09/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 17
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019
2019-03-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 14
2019-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203
2019-02-26HousePublic Hearing: 03/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback