NH HB546 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to medical examinations under workers' compensation.
Title
Relative to medical examinations under workers' compensation.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Rep. Timothy Copeland [R] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] |
Rep. Herbert Richardson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0256 |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1714 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Conference Committee Report #2103c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1698 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2103c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2013-2103c; Senate Amendment, Filed |
2013-06-13 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/18/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Sanborn, Cataldo, Soucy |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-05 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps A.White, Flanagan, Weed, and St.James; House Journal 49, PG.1566 |
2013-06-05 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1590s and Requests C of C (Rep A.White): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1566 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1590s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1590s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1590s, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Hearing: 4/23/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0642h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.762-763 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0642h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.762-763 |
2013-03-06 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0642h; House Calendar 22, PG.554-555 |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0642h for Mar 13 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.508 |
2013-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-02-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 2/28/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG.199 |