NH HB545 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amending the victims' bill of rights.
Title
Amending the victims' bill of rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Hynes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 5 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB545-FN 02/10/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 4 |
2023-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/10/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2023 12:15 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 20 |