NH HB544 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1262-1263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing the general court to deny a utility the use of the power of eminent domain.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing the general court to deny a utility the use of the power of eminent domain.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1262-1263
2015-03-05HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2015-03-05HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 435
2015-03-05HouseExecutive Session: 3/3/2015 Legislative Office Building 304
2015-02-11HousePublic Hearing: 2/19/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2015-02-11House===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 3:15 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2015-02-10HousePublic Hearing: 2/17/2015 3:15 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 12, PG. 229

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback