NH HB543 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB543
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 253; I. Sec 3 eff. 12/1/2023 II. Rem eff. 6/24/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 253; I. Sec 3 eff. 12/1/2023 II. Rem eff. 6/24/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study nuclear power and nuclear reactor technology in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a commission to study nuclear power and nuclear reactor technology in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 253; I. Sec 3 eff. 12/1/2023 II. Rem eff. 6/24/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Vose): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2022-1369s and 2022-1507s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2022-1507s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1369s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1369s, 04/14/2022; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Hearing: 04/07/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 1 |
2021-11-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-11-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass HB543 11/15/2021 (Vote 15-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 42 |
2021-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-09-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-06-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 06/21/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98681120846 |
2021-03-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92752912485 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 53 |
Same As/Similar To
HB543 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304