NH HB542 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a grant program to support municipalities in updating their wetlands regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a grant program to support municipalities in updating their wetlands regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - OTPA (Y: 208 N: 140 NV: 9 Abs: 43) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
2019-10-02HouseExecutive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-10-02HouseDivision I Work Session: 10/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2019-03-14HouseRetained in Committee
2019-03-06HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-02-28HouseFinance Division I Work Session: 03/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Finance 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 16
2019-02-28HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0182h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 208-140 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 13
2019-02-28HouseAmendment # 2019-0182h: Amendment Adopted DV 211-117 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 13
2019-02-21HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-21HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0182h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 24
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback