NH HB542 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Law Without Signature 07/27/2013; Effective 07/27/2013; Chapter 0279; NH Constitution, Art.44, Pt.II
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the renewable energy fund and regulation of telephone, Voice Over Internet Protocol, and IP-enabled service providers and relative to electric renewable portfolio standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the renewable energy fund and regulation of telephone, Voice Over Internet Protocol, and IP-enabled service providers and relative to electric renewable portfolio standards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-29HouseLaw Without Signature 07/27/2013; Effective 07/27/2013; Chapter 0279; NH Constitution, Art.44, Pt.II
2013-06-26HouseEnrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1716
2013-06-26SenateEnrolled
2013-06-26HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2191e Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1715
2013-06-26SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2191e Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-06-26HouseConference Committee Report #2149c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1697
2013-06-26SenateConference Committee Report 2149c; Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-06-20SenateConference Committee Report #2013-2149c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed
2013-06-13HouseCommittee of Conference Meeting: 6/19/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2013-06-12SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Odell, Bradley, Fuller Clark
2013-06-12SenateSen. Prescott Moved Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-06-12HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps Kaen, N.Levasseur, Cali-Pitts and Introne [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1651
2013-06-12HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment's #1617s, #2012s(NT), and #2020s(NT) and Requests C of C (Rep. Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1651
2013-06-06SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 1617s, 2012s, New Title, and 2020s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg
2013-06-06SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2013-2020s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-06-06SenateSen. Odell Floor Amendment #2013-2012s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-06-06SenateCommittee Amendment 1617s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-06-06SenateWithout Objection, HB 542 is Special Order to the end of the Regular Calendar, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted;
2013-05-30SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1617s, 6/6/13; Senate Calendar 23
2013-05-30SenateWithout Objection, HB 542 is Special Ordered to the Next Session Day, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted;
2013-05-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1617s, 5/30/13; Senate Calendar 22
2013-05-23SenateWithout Objection, HB 542 is Special Ordered to the Next Session Day, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted;
2013-05-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1617s, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21
2013-04-04SenateHearing: 4/10/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15
2013-03-21SenateIntroduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources
2013-03-20HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #0634h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.890
2013-03-20HouseAmendment #0634h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.890
2013-03-07HouseProposed Committee Amendment #2013-0634h; House Calendar 23 PG.619
2013-03-07HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0634h for Mar 20 (Vote 19-0; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.597
2013-02-21HouseExecutive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2013-02-13HouseFull Committee Work Session: 2/28/2013 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2013-02-13HousePublic Hearing: 2/21/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 12, PG.199

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback