NH HB542 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-18 - House Vetoed By Governor 07/13/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to exceptions for objectionable material in public school courses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to exceptions for objectionable material in public school courses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-22 - Senate - Conference Committee Report 2422 (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - ADOPT COC REPORT #2422C (Y: 240 N: 108 NV: 49 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - NON-CONCUR REQ C OF C (REP BALBONI) (Y: 246 N: 105 NV: 46 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - OTP/AM 0726H(NT) (Y: 197 N: 148 NV: 53 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-18 House Vetoed By Governor 07/13/2011
2011-06-22 House Enrolled; House Journal 57, PG.1859
2011-06-22 Senate Enrolled
2011-06-22 House Conference Committee Report #2422c Adopted, Regular Calendar 240-108; House Journal 57, PG.1845-1847
2011-06-22 Senate Conference Committee Report 2422c; Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Adopted
2011-06-16 Senate Conference Committee Report #2011-2422c; Senate Amendment, Filed
2011-06-14 Senate Conferee Change; Senator Carson Replaces Senator Kelly
2011-06-14 House ==RECONVENE== Conference Committee Meeting: 6/14/2011 2:25 PM Legislative Office Building 103
2011-06-10 House Conference Committee Meeting: 6/14/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 ==RECESSED==
2011-06-08 Senate President Appoints: Senators Stiles, Forsythe and Kelly
2011-06-08 Senate Sen. Stiles Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote
2011-06-08 House Speaker Appoints: Reps Balboni, Pitre, Hill, and Flanagan; House Journal 51, PG.1717-1720
2011-06-08 House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2251s(NT) and Requests C of C (Rep Balboni): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 246-105; House Journal 51, PG.1717-1720
2011-06-01 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 19, Pg.539
2011-06-01 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 2251s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 19, Pg.522
2011-06-01 Senate Sen. Forsythe Floor Amendment #2011-2251s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.522
2011-06-01 Senate Sen. Forsythe moved Ought to Pass; Senate Journal 19, Pg.522
2011-06-01 Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Division 5Y-16N, Motion Failed; Senate Journal 19, Pg.522
2011-06-01 Senate Sen. Forsythe Moved Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.521
2011-04-13 Senate Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 12, Pg.247
2011-04-13 Senate Inexpedient to Legislate Not Voted On
2011-04-06 Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 4/13/11; Senate Calendar 19
2011-03-29 Senate Hearing: 4/5/11, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 18
2011-03-23 Senate Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 11, Pg.193
2011-03-15 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0726h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 197-148; House Journal 26, PG.788-791
2011-03-15 House Amendment #0726h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.788-789
2011-03-09 House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 22, PG.550-551
2011-03-09 House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-0726h (New Title); House Calendar 23, PG.641
2011-03-09 House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0726h(NT) for Mar 15 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.550-551
2011-03-04 House ==RECONVENE== Executive Session 3/9/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2011-02-18 House Executive Session: 3/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 ==RECESSED==
2011-02-09 House Public Hearing: 2/24/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2011-01-24 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Education; House Journal 11, PG. 190

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=828&sy=2011&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2011&q=1
Texthttp://www.gencourt.state.nh.us/legislation/2011/HB0542.html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=72&sy=2011&lb=H&eb=HB0542&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2011&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=828
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=222&sy=2011&lb=H&eb=HB0542&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2011&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=828
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=238&sy=2011&lb=H&eb=HB0542&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2011&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=828
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=41&sy=2011&lb=S&eb=HB0542&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2011&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=828
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=93&sy=2011&lb=S&eb=HB0542&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2011&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=828

Bill Comments

feedback