NH HB540 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 32; Eff: 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the issuance of bonds by the county for redevelopment districts in unincorporated places.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the issuance of bonds by the county for redevelopment districts in unincorporated places.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 32; Eff: 05/15/2019
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 42
2019-05-03SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16
2019-04-18SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/18/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 18
2019-04-04SenateHearing: 04/09/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 17
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-20HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0996h: Motion Adopted DV 287-60 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 17
2019-03-20HouseAmendment # 2019-0996h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 17
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0996h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 31
2019-03-06HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-02-13House==TIME CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-01-31HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback