NH HB537 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Lay on Table (Rep. Cleaver): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Lay on Table (Rep. Cleaver): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the release of motor vehicle records.
Title
Relative to the release of motor vehicle records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Cleaver): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 44 |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/14/2019 (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 13 |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing: 02/26/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 19 |