NH HB534 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 292; Eff: 09/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to certain major state projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to certain major state projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 1481s (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-30HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 292; Eff: 09/27/2019
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27SenateConference Committee Report # 2019-2529c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27HouseConference Committee Report 2529c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-06-19SenateConference Committee Report Filed, # 2019-2529c; 06/27/2019
2019-06-13HouseConference Committee Meeting: 06/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201
2019-06-12SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Watters, Kahn, Ward; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-12SenateSen. Watters Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Edgar, Graham, Jack, Abbott 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 11
2019-05-23HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1755s and Requests CofC (Rep. Cloutier): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 11
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1755s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1755s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-01SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1755s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1315s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-11SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-1481s, Regular Calendar 10Y-13N, Amendment Failed; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-11SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1315s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-01SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1315s, 04/11/2019; Senate Calendar 17
2019-03-21SenateHearing: 03/26/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 8
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 21
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 10
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 3 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback