NH HB532 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB532
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-18 - ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-18 - ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creating an animal records database.
Title
Creating an animal records database.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Bixby [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - OTPA (Y: 214 N: 141 NV: 14 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-18 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-08-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/07/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-30 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Public Hearing: 03/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99357402693 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 37 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment : Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-141 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 37 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0211h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 37 |
2021-02-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-02-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0211h (Vote 16-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 19 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92887623403 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 2 P. 52 |
Same As/Similar To
HB532 (Carry Over) 2021-08-18 - ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.