NH HB531 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB531
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. B. Griffin): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. B. Griffin): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Relative to determining the qualifications of voters and establishing provisional voter registration and provisional ballots.
Title
Relative to determining the qualifications of voters and establishing provisional voter registration and provisional ballots.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Lynn [R] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. B. Griffin): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-11-17 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study HB531-FN-LOCAL 11/17/2021 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 30 |
2021-11-12 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Public Hearing: 03/08/2021 10:30 am Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/91394352757 |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 52 |
Same As/Similar To
HB531 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Retained in Committee
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=537&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB531 |