NH HB529 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Enrolled Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 04/08/2021); Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to cruelty to a wild animal, fish, or wild bird.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to cruelty to a wild animal, fish, or wild bird.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateEnrolled Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 04/08/2021); Senate Journal 12
2021-04-12HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021
2021-04-01SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-03-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/01/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
2021-03-17SenateRemote Hearing: 03/22/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7
2021-02-24HouseReferral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 47(f) 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 72
2021-02-24HouseReferred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 10
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 10
2021-02-08HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 7
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2021 01:30 pm Remote info same as above
2021-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94410519799 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 2 P. 52

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback