NH HB526 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating the bureau of certificate of title.
Title
Eliminating the bureau of certificate of title.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 22 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 11 |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 18 |