NH HB524 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB524
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Interim Study Work Session: 06/16/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Interim Study Work Session: 06/16/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Summary
Requiring the secretary of state to conduct random verification counts of polling place results.
Title
Requiring the secretary of state to conduct random verification counts of polling place results.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Interim Study Work Session: 06/16/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-01-10 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-17 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study HB524-FN 11/17/2021 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 9 |
2021-11-12 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2021 01:00 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/91394352757 |
2021-03-05 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2021 10:15 am Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/99327579520Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/10/2021 10:20 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95087806399 (if necessary) |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 52 |
Same As/Similar To
HB524 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Retained in Committee
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=755&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB524 |