NH HB524 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the definition of "emergency" for purposes of a quorum under the right-to-know law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of "emergency" for purposes of a quorum under the right-to-know law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-04SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/11/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22
2017-04-12SenateHearing: 04/18/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 19
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0354h: Motion Adopted DV 185-164 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 19
2017-03-09HouseAmendment #2017-0354h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 19
2017-02-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-02-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0354h (NT) for 03/08/2017 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-15House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-02-01House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2017 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback