NH HB523 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/09/2021; Chapter 111; Eff: 09/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/09/2021; Chapter 111; Eff: 09/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a person who registers to vote without any identification to have his or her photo taken before his or her registration to vote is complete.
Title
Requiring a person who registers to vote without any identification to have his or her photo taken before his or her registration to vote is complete.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - OTP (Y: 197 N: 172 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/09/2021; Chapter 111; Eff: 09/07/2021 |
2021-07-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1384s (Rep. B. Griffin): Motion Adopted DV 199-160 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 9 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1384s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1384s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1384s, 05/20/2021; Senate Calendar 24 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 05/03/2021, 09:50 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 197-172 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 63 |
2021-03-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-03-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 43 |
2021-03-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2021 12:00 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/99327579520 |
2021-03-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/10/2021 10:10 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95087806399 (if necessary) |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2021 12:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95709405955 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 52 |