NH HB52 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB52
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 05/27/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 05/27/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Apportioning congressional districts.
Title
Apportioning congressional districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-05 - House - OTPA (Y: 186 N: 164 NV: 20 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 174 N: 182 NV: 14 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2022-01-05 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 167 N: 189 NV: 14 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2022-01-05 - House - Table (Y: 177 N: 178 NV: 15 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-05 - House - OTPA (Y: 186 N: 164 NV: 20 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 174 N: 182 NV: 14 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2022-01-05 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 167 N: 189 NV: 14 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2022-01-05 - House - Table (Y: 177 N: 178 NV: 15 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 05/27/2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 03/31/2022); Senate Journal 8 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Floor Amendment # 2022-1136s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/17/2022; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2022, Room Representatives Hall, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Reconsider Special Order (Rep. Cali-Pitts): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 35-316 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-10 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Failed Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-10 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-2271h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 186-164 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-10 | House | Amendment # 2021-2245h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 167-189 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-10 | House | Amendment # 2021-2271h: Amendment Adopted DV 184-171 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-10 | House | Reconsider Special order (Rep. Cali-Pitts): Motion Failed DV 35-316 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-10 | House | Special Order To next order of business (Rep. B. Griffin): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-10 | House | FLAM # 2022-2301h (Rep. Abramson): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 174-182 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-10 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Silber): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 177-178 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-22 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2245h |
2021-11-22 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2271h 11/16/2021 (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 43 |
2021-11-09 | House | Executive Session: 11/16/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-03-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing: 03/09/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94125334680 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Special Committee on Redistricting House Journal 2 P. 55 |
Same As/Similar To
HB52 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Retained in Committee