NH HB519 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Executive Session: 02/13/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303
Pending: House Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to selection of delegates to an Article V convention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to selection of delegates to an Article V convention.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 02/06/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback