NH HB519 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 172; Effective Date 6/26/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 172; Effective Date 6/26/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study policies which it determines are necessary for dyslexic students.
Title
Establishing a committee to study policies which it determines are necessary for dyslexic students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 172; Effective Date 6/26/2015 |
2015-06-18 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 6/11/2015); House Journal 46, PG. 1993 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/11/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1278s (Rep Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1812 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1278s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1278s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1278s, New Title, 4/30/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1278s, New Title, 4/23/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing: 4/7/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 874 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 11 (Vote 17-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 421 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 228 |