NH HB516 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Executive Session: 03/08/2021 01:00 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/91394352757
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Hearing: Mar 4 @ 10:15 am in Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/
Hearing: Mar 8 @ 1:00 pm in Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing voters to vote by absentee ballot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing voters to vote by absentee ballot.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08HouseExecutive Session: 03/08/2021 01:00 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/91394352757
2021-03-04HousePublic Hearing: 03/04/2021 10:15 am Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/91092569734Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 52

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback