NH HB516 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to funding for pollution control equipment at the Powder Mill fish hatchery through the purchase of a trout/salmon stamp.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to funding for pollution control equipment at the Powder Mill fish hatchery through the purchase of a trout/salmon stamp.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019
2019-02-20HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2019-02-15HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 20
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 3 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback