NH HB514 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1959s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Imposing a waiting period between the purchase and delivery of a firearm.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imposing a waiting period between the purchase and delivery of a firearm.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 199 N: 147 NV: 20 Abs: 34) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1959s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1959s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateSpecial Order to the beginning of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1959s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-04-24SenateHearing: 04/30/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0421h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-147 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 99
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0421h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 99
2019-03-13HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-13HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0421h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 24
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-16House==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 02/13/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback