NH HB513 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Enrolled Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 04/08/2021); Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the degree granting authority of Signum university and relative to the authority of the higher education commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the degree granting authority of Signum university and relative to the authority of the higher education commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - OTP (Y: 190 N: 155 NV: 17 Abs: 36) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateEnrolled Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 04/08/2021); Senate Journal 12
2021-04-12HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021
2021-03-25SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/25/2021; Senate Journal 9
2021-03-17SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/25/2021; Senate Calendar 16
2021-03-10SenateRemote Hearing: 03/16/2021, 09:45 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7
2021-02-25HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 190-155 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 28
2021-02-10HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-02-10HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 28
2021-01-20HousePublic Hearing: 01/26/2021 11:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91325381640 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 51

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback