NH HB509 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB509
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-05 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-05 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the phasing out of the minimum electric renewable portfolio standard.
Title
Relative to the phasing out of the minimum electric renewable portfolio standard.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36 |
2023-02-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 18 |
Same As/Similar To
HB509 (Carry Over) 2023-09-05 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36