NH HB505 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Special Order to 2/27/2019 Without Objection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing voters to vote for multiple candidates for an office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing voters to vote for multiple candidates for an office.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseSpecial Order to 2/27/2019 Without Objection
2019-02-14HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Abramson) 02/14/2019
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
2019-01-23HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback