NH HB503 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Remote Hearing: 04/28/2021, 09:45 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 21
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Codifying the council on housing stability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Codifying the council on housing stability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - Reconsider (Y: 142 N: 214 NV: 42 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateRemote Hearing: 04/28/2021, 09:45 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 21
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-08HouseReconsider (Rep. Verville): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 142-214 04/08/2021
2021-04-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0678h: Motion Adopted DV 210-115 04/08/2021
2021-04-08HouseLay on Table (Rep. Sylvia): Motion Failed DV 140-213 04/08/2021
2021-04-08HouseAmendment # 2021-0678h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/08/2021
2021-03-11HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-11HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0678h (Vote 19-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 49
2021-03-02HousePublic Hearing: 03/02/2021 11:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following links:1. To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99282187833 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 51

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback