NH HB502 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-03 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-03 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to petitions for verification of checklists.
Title
Relative to petitions for verification of checklists.
Sponsors
Rep. Catherine Cheney [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] | Rep. James Grenier [R] | Rep. Valerie Fraser [R] |
Rep. Jordan Ulery [R] | Rep. John Mullen [R] | Rep. Barbara Griffin [R] | Rep. Laura Jones [R] |
Rep. Herb Vadney [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Sen. Bradley withdrew Laid on Table motion |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Sen. Bradley moved Laid on Table |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Sen. Pierce moved Rereferred to Committee |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 10Y-13N, Motion Failed; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/7/15; Senate Calendar 20 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 4/2/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-02-18 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 498 |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 18 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 238 |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/10/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG. 226 |